U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00397
  • Case Name: Jones et al v. Dale Barnes Trucking Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2023: [Objections]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Complete ADR]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extend Time to Complete ADR]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 17, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.