U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00399
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Oklahoma County Detention Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Address Change]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 30, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • November 02, 2022: [Receipt]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Affidavit]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 17, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.