U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00398
  • Case Name: Williams v. Levick et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.