U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00403
  • Case Name: Imoe v. SSM Healthcare of Oklahoma Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 17, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Compel]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 20, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2022: [Strike]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.