U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00402
  • Case Name: McArthur v. GEO Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.