U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00400
  • Case Name: Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • November 14, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 10, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.