U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00407
  • Case Name: Ferree v. Prudential Insurance Company of America The
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 01, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.