U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00406
  • Case Name: Ellis v. Crow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • May 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.