U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00410
  • Case Name: Hammon v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 13, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • June 03, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.