U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00409
  • Case Name: Pinson v. FNU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • July 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.