U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00413
  • Case Name: West et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Certificate]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 23, 2022: [Certificate]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • May 20, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • May 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.