U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00408
  • Case Name: Banks v. GEO Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.