U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00415
  • Case Name: Llanusa v. Westlake Hardware et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • September 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • August 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 25, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.