U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Taylor et al v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 05, 2023: [Objections]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 29, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 29, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • December 29, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 29, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 20, 2022: [Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • May 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.