U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00421
  • Case Name: Halliburton Energy Services Inc v. Swaggin Wagon Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 07, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.