U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00423
  • Case Name: Burress v. Woods et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.