U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00424
  • Case Name: Elkins v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.