U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00426
  • Case Name: Coffman v. First Physicians Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 27, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.