U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00425
  • Case Name: Kiowa Tribe et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • November 03, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Stay Case]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 14, 2022: [Declaration]
  • July 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 16, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 16, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Declaration]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.