U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00427
  • Case Name: Ratliff et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.