U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00429
  • Case Name: Hill v. P.A.M. Cartage Carriers LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 02, 2022: [Certificate]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • May 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.