U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00431
  • Case Name: Petties v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 27, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.