U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00433
  • Case Name: Peeler v. Wal Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 27, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • May 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 27, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.