U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00436
  • Case Name: Dunn v. Crow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • November 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 16, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • August 16, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 08, 2022: [Receipt]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 31, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.