U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00437
  • Case Name: Mayes v. Dowling et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 05, 2022: [Strike]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 31, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • May 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.