U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00441
  • Case Name: Clemens v. Companion Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Remand]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set Aside]
  • June 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.