U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00440
  • Case Name: Smith v. FedEx et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Brief]
  • June 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • June 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.