U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00446
  • Case Name: Laffoon v. Bridges et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 04, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 27, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 06, 2022: [Supplement]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 24, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 23, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Receipt]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.