U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00444
  • Case Name: The Cookson Hills Christian Schools INC v. Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • June 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.