U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00442
  • Case Name: Living Investment LLC v. Third Coast Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • July 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.