U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00439
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Oklahoma State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • June 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.