U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00443
  • Case Name: THB Holdings LLC v. Table Investments LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.