U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Anderson v. CSAA General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 31, 2022: [Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.