U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00448
  • Case Name: Horton et al v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 14, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.