U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00449
  • Case Name: Sonic Industries LLC et al v. Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Bankruptcy]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • August 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Expedite]
  • August 18, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 05, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • June 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brief]
  • June 10, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.