U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00450
  • Case Name: Birmingham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 02, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.