U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00477
  • Case Name: Chester v. Altus City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 08, 2022: [Receipt]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.