U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00479
  • Case Name: Stephens v. West Coast Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.