U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00478
  • Case Name: Baker et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Conditional Transfer Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 15, 2022: [Conditional Transfer Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.