U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00480
  • Case Name: Tudor v. Galindo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Deposit Funds]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Recusal]
  • January 09, 2023: [Settlement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 23, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 23, 2022: [Crossclaim]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.