U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00482
  • Case Name: Ricketts v. Logan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 14, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.