U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00481
  • Case Name: York v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.