U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00487
  • Case Name: Hunt v. Independent School District No. 8 of Comanche County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.