U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00489
  • Case Name: Compise v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.