U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00491
  • Case Name: Truong et al v. Stitt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [USCA Order]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [USCA Order and Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 16, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • August 16, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.