U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00492
  • Case Name: Sullian v. Walmart Stores Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • June 21, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 15, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.