U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00493
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 03, 2023: [Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • September 19, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 13, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • September 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.