U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00494
  • Case Name: Ervin v. U-Haul Co of Oklahoma Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Stay Case]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • June 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.