U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00490
  • Case Name: Wallace v. Malachi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 18, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 11, 2022: [Supplement]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 16, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.