U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00495
  • Case Name: Barker v. El Habti
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 30, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 28, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 28, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 15, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 16, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.